+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- INS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
March 30, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 29, 2016: Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 29, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 2, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor