+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Gray - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Gray - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
April 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2016: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor