+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend(ref Biggs flr amend 3/19/14 11:11 p.m.)
- Amendment failed: Pancrazi flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Pancrazi to include the Pancrazi flr amend
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend(ref Biggs flr amend 11:11 p.m.) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1