+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref FIN) withdrawn
- FIN (ref Bill) withdrawn
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
February 3, 2020: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor