+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-20 approp_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-17 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2