+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass amended
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Withdrawn
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-19approp_caucus-floor-revised
Senate Fact Sheet
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
3-10 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
March 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 20, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor