+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Line item veto - signed
- Chapter: 17
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Amendment passed: Sub floor Amend to APPROP
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- House second read
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Pierce flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the APPROPRIATIONS Committee Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the APPROPRIATIONS Committee Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
4-1 approp_aspassedfinalread
Senate Fact Sheet
3-17 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
March 20, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1