+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pmobject
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 31, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor