+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land & Agriculture Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 3, 2020: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 3, 2020: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor