+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 9
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Amended by APPROP - Kavanagh
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Kavanagh
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Alston
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Campbell to include the Campbell amendment to Bill
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- House second read
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Begay #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Begay #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
3-18 approp_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
3-17 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
March 20, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2