+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-29 gr_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor