+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment failed: Pancrazi flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs #1 flr amend (ref Biggs flr amend 3/20/14 3:35 a.m.)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs #2 flr amend (ref Biggs flr amend 3/20/14 3:35 a.m.)
- Amendment failed: Cajero Bedford flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Hobbs #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Hobbs #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Hobbs #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Landrum Taylor #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Landrum Taylor #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: McGuire flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Pancrazi flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Hobbs to include the Hobbs #1 flr amend
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Pierce #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Pierce #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Pierce #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Tovar #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Tovar #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Tovar #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Pancrazi to include the Pancrazi flr amend
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Cajero Bedford to include the Cajero Bedford flr amend
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Tovar to include the Tovar #1 flr amend
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Tovar to include the Tovar #3 flr amend
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Sen Hobbs to include the Hobbs #3 flr amend
- Committee of the Whole:
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
McComish flr amend (ref Senate Engrossed Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Senate Engrossed Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs #2 flr amend (ref Biggs 3:35 a.m.) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs #1 flr amend (ref Biggs 3:35 a.m.) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1