+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 8
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pratt
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- House first read
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pmobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-21 cem-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 8, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
April 8, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 17, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor