+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
January 31, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor