+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:19 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Withdrawn
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
2-28 fin_caucus-floor_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
2-16 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2012: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
January 31, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor