+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 232
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Nelson, Adams, Ulmer
- Senate discharge:
- House discharge:
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Senate appointed: O'Halleran, Aboud, Allen C
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CMMA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to CMMA - Nelson
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: O'Halleran flr amend (ref CED)
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (17)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Nelson Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Nelson Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2-16 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-27 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-12ced strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 21, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 6
March 22, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2007: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor