+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Lopez flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall #5 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Worsley flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: McGuire #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: McGuire #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Pancrazi flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Senate second read
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (16)
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall #5 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
McGuire #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lopez flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall #3 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
May 14, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3