+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Amended by GOV - Kavanagh - passed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass amended.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:28PM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 24, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
March 7, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 7, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
March 7, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
March 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 5, 2019: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor