+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 158
- Action: Signed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Senator Ableser to include the Gallardo flr amend
- Third read: Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
4-22 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 8
April 25, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor