+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 263
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 am
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2-13 gr-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
4-5 vmga_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
April 4, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor