+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 17
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Ableser flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Contreras flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Quezada flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Senator Quezada to include the Quezada flr amend
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Quezada flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Contreras flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ableser flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3