+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: withdrawn.
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: withdrawn.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:29PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
February 3, 2020: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor