+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 81
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pm
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-14 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 10, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 10, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 5, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor