+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- House Health Committee: withdrawn.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
March 1, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 29, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 29, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 2, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor