+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 33
- Action: Signed
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:00 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref TRANS)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-3- as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
2-15 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-8 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
5-8trans_aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 18, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor