+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- RULES (ref APPROP) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 3, 2020: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor