+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 18 10 2 0 y passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator gray motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1470 on third reading on march 5, 2012. motion carried.
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref GR)
- Amendment adopted: Klein flr amend (ref GR)
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Klein flr amend (ref GR) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor