+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting concurrence or conference
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WM - Olson
- Amendment passed: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to WAYS AND MEANS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to WAYS AND MEANS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-20 fin_strikermemo_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2-18 fin_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2013: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2013: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor