+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 353
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 1, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor