+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:19 pmobject
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-13 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
January 31, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2