+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Kerr flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor