+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CWD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) (sub CWD)
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend (ref Biggs flr amend)
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Farley flr amend (ref Biggs flr amend) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) (sub CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1