+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref PSMT)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref PSMT) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 5, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6