+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-28 jud_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-10 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
March 21, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor