+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard - passed by s/v 32-24
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Representative Clark to exclude the Mesnard flr amendment
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Gray flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
March 12, 2018: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 12, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 30, 2018: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor