+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 172
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: AWL
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RAE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rural Affairs and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Proposed Amendment
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 26, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 3, 2015: Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor