+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2008: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1