+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:41PM.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor