+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref PSMT)
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref PSMT) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor