+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Shope flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12
March 1, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor