+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Vote
January 30, 2020: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor