+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 357
- Action: Signed
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Goodale
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Goodale Floor Amendment; Reference to the EDUCATION Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Carter Floor Amendment; Reference to the EDUCATION Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
2-2 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
April 2, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
March 19, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2012: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor