+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:54PM.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 4, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2018: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 30, 2018: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor