+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: withdrawn.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: held.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 7, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor