+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
May 8, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2017: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 31, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor