+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Approp
- Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-2 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2012: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2012: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor