+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading on reconsideration
- Senator mccomish motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1452 on third reading on march 18, 2013. motion carried.
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Third read: Failed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2013: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 7, 2013: Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor