+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: held.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Brophy McGee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 31, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor