+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor