+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - Bolding - failed by s/v 21-25
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pm
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 25, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor